Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Thaddeus Lawton, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sokoto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1913BornSouth Boston, MA, USA
16 Aug 193723.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Jun 194329.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Jan 195440.3AppointedPrefect of Sokoto, Nigeria
13 Nov 195441.1InstalledPrefect of Sokoto, Nigeria
16 Jun 196450.7AppointedBishop of Sokoto, Nigeria
15 Aug 196450.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sokoto, Nigeria
19 Dec 196653.2DiedBishop of Sokoto, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Edward Thaddeus Lawton:
Bishop Edward Thaddeus Lawton O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Sokoto

  • a priest for 23.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013