Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Francis Sheehan, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kano, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1932Born
25 Feb 195623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
21 Sep 197038.3AppointedBishop of Yola, Nigeria
6 Jan 197138.6Ordained BishopBishop of Yola, Nigeria
5 Jul 199664.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kano, Nigeria
22 Jun 199967.0AppointedBishop of Kano, Nigeria
20 Mar 200875.8RetiredBishop of Kano, Nigeria
8 Nov 201280.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Kano, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Patrick Francis Sheehan
Bishop Patrick Francis Sheehan O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoyle, Ireland

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2008
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast