Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John of the Cross Anyogu

Deceased

Bishop of Enugu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1898BornOnitsha
8 Dec 193032.5Ordained PriestPriest of Southern Nigeria {Nigeria Meridionale}
15 Feb 195758.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Onitsha, Nigeria
15 Feb 195758.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Magnesia ad Maeandrum
9 Jun 195759.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magnesia ad Maeandrum
12 Nov 196264.5AppointedBishop of Enugu, Nigeria
5 Jul 196769.1DiedBishop of Enugu, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for John of the Cross Anyogu:
Bishop John of the Cross Anyogu (born , died ) Bishop of Enugu

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015