Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Franz Josef Gebert

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Vegesela in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1949 Born
10 Oct 197728.6Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
31 May 201768.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
31 May 201768.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Vegesela in Byzacena
3 Sep 201768.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vegesela in Byzacena

MicroData Summary for Franz Josef Gebert
Father Franz Josef Gebert (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchweich, Diocese of Trier
Ordained BishopCathedral, Trier, Diocese of Trier

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Trier.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2017
  • ob/c1: CB, 31 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 May 2017