Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diomede Panici

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

Titular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1841Born
2 Oct 189655.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
19 Apr 190059.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
1 May 190059.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
6 Aug 190968.5DiedSecretary of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

MicroData Summary for Diomede Panici
Archbishop Diomede Panici (born , died ) Secretary of (Sacred) Rites

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmaseno, Diocese of Ferentino, Italy
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 332
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1911

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 30 Nov 2020

Quantcast