Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Flavio Cardinal Chigi (Jr.)

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1711Born
26 Nov 175342.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
26 Nov 175342.2Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 175342.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
2 Jun 175442.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
12 Feb 175947.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
12 Feb 175947.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
12 Jul 177159.8DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)

MicroData Summary for Flavio Chigi (Jr.)
Flavio Cardinal Chigi (Jr.) (born , died ) Prefect of (Sacred) Rites

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 17.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1753

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast