Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Placido Ralli

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

Secretary of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1804Born
22 Dec 182723.0Ordained PriestPriest
Apr 187570.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
3 Jul 188277.6AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
23 Jul 188277.6Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
11 Dec 188480.0DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

MicroData Summary for Placido Ralli
Patriarch Placido Ralli (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 107
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 41
  • x903: CB, 13 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast