Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal La Fontaine

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1860Born
22 Dec 188323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
6 Dec 190646.0AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
23 Dec 190646.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
1 Apr 191049.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
1 Apr 191049.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
5 Mar 191554.2AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
4 Dec 191656.0Elevated to Cardinal
7 Dec 191656.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
7 Mar 192160.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
9 Jul 193574.6DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro La Fontaine (VIAF: 29434124)
Pietro Cardinal La Fontaine (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania
Ordained BishopCollege Capranica, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVilla Fietta

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
  • a cardinal for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 4 Dec 1916
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1906, Number 82
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 525, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,074, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,372

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 23 Nov 2020

Quantcast