Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Shkodrė-Pult

Archidioecesis Scodrensis-Pulatensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Angelo Massafra, O.F.M., Archbishop
  • Ernest Simoni, Cardinal, Priest

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • United: 25 January 2005
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Albania
  • Square Kilometers: 4,113 (1,588 Square Miles)
  • Web Site: http://www.kishakatolikeshkoder.com/
  • Mailing Address: Kryeipeshkvia, Sheshi Gjon Pali II, Shkodėr, Shqipėria
  • Telephone: (022)427.44
  • Fax: 436.73

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Shkodrė (Scutari)
345ErectedDiocese of Shkodrė (Scutari) (erected)
Archdiocese of Shkodrė
14 March 1867ElevatedDiocese of Shkodrė (Scutari) Archdiocese of Shkodrė
8 October 1886ElevatedArchdiocese of Shkodrė (became a Metropolitan)
Archdiocese of Shkodrė-Pult
25 January 2005UnitedDiocese of Pult (Pulati)
Archdiocese of Shkodrė
Archdiocese of Shkodrė-Pult

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Shkodrė
1999255,000300,00085.0%1517327,968456627ap2000
2000255,000300,00085.0%1422367,083496627ap2001
2001130,000200,00065.0%1626423,0955310929ap2002
2002130,000200,00065.0%1928472,7654811329ap2003
2003132,800202,80065.5%1829472,8254911629ap2004
2004132,800202,80065.5%1830482,7665111929ap2005
Archdiocese of Shkodrė-Pult
2010164,900236,30269.8%2336592,7945416943ap2011
2014166,700238,00070.0%2134553,0306215840ap2015
2017167,000250,30066.7%1832503,3405615643ap2018

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Shkodrė (Scutari)
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 440
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 232
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 294
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 307
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 347
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.4, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 27 Sep 2020

Quantcast