Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Logorezzi

Deceased

Archbishop of Skopje, North Macedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1830Born
7 Jun 185625.6Ordained PriestPriest of ShkodrŽ, Albania
7 Jan 188756.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of ShkodrŽ, Albania
7 Jan 188756.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
15 May 188756.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
15 Jun 188857.6AppointedArchbishop of Skopje, North Macedonia
29 Dec 189161.1DiedArchbishop of Skopje, North Macedonia

MicroData Summary for Andrea Logorezzi
Archbishop Andrea Logorezzi (born , died ) Archbishop of Skopje

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShkodrŽ, Archdiocese of ShkodrŽ, Albania
Ordained BishopCathedral, ShkodrŽ, Archdiocese of ShkodrŽ, Albania

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 327, and Page 505
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1887, Number 26
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,797

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast