Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ernest Cardinal Simoni

Priest of Shkodrë-Pult, Albania

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1928 Born
7 Apr 195627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Shkodrë, Albania
19 Nov 201688.0Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 201688.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
11 Feb 201788.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala

MicroData Summary
Ernest Simoni
Ernest Cardinal Simoni
(born )
Priest of Shkodrë-Pult

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTroshani, Archdiocese of Shkodrë
Ordained PriestSanta Stefano, Cathedral, Shkodrë, Archdiocese of Shkodrë

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Shkodrë-Pult.

  • a priest for years
  • a cardinal for years

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2016
  • i: Bollettino, 6 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025