Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernest Maria «oba

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of ShkodrŽ, Albania

Titular Bishop of MidaŽum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1912Born
9 Feb 193623.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jan 195239.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of ShkodrŽ, Albania
21 Jan 195239.9AppointedTitular Bishop of MidaŽum
20 Apr 195240.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of MidaŽum
8 Jan 198067.8DiedApostolic Administrator of ShkodrŽ, Albania

MicroData Summary for Ernest Maria «oba
Bishop Ernest Maria «oba (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of ShkodrŽ

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShkodrŽ, Archdiocese of ShkodrŽ
Ordained BishopShkodrŽ, Archdiocese of ShkodrŽ

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1952, Number 28
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 49, Number 3,369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast