Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Łomża

Dioecesis Lomzensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 28 October 1925
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Białystok
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Poland
  • Square Kilometers: 11,500 (4,441 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.kuria.lomza.pl/
  • Mailing Address: Kuria Diecezjalna, ul. Sadowa 3, 18-400 Lomza, Polska
  • Telephone: (086)473.46.11
  • Fax: 473.46.31

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów
25 March 1798ErectedDiocese of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów (erected)
1818Territory AddedDiocese of Wigry (suppressed) Diocese of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów
Diocese of Łomża
28 October 1925Name ChangedDiocese of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów Diocese of Łomża
4 April 1926Territory LostDiocese of Łomża Diocese of Vilkaviškis (erected)
13 April 1991Territory LostDiocese of Łomża
Archdiocese of Vilnius
Diocese of Grodno (erected)
25 March 1992Territory LostDiocese of Łomża
Diocese of Warmia (Ermland)
Diocese of Ełk (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Łomża
1950558,724600,00093.1%22962352,37713110136ap1951
1970570,000580,00098.3%31783251,75325190136ap1971
1980605,000637,00095.0%335173521,71824200142ap1981
1990628,000637,00098.6%382284101,53135220164ap1991
1999578,066587,17398.4%415184331,33527190169ap2000
2000574,656581,17298.9%430194491,27927190174ap2001
2001574,387580,72398.9%439214601,24829183176ap2002
2002576,197583,38798.8%438224601,25230182177ap2003
2003570,403579,28098.5%444214651,22630182177ap2004
2004567,035573,64798.8%453234761,19132181179ap2005
2013538,065542,97599.1%490295191,03634138181ap2014
2016518,458522,80199.2%4902951999837128183ap2017
2019502,655506,81899.2%49827525957136117183ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast