Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Romuald Jałbrzykowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Vilnius, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1876Born
9 Mar 190125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
29 Jul 191842.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
29 Jul 191842.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cusae
30 Nov 191842.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cusae
14 Dec 192549.8AppointedBishop of Łomża, Poland
24 Jun 192650.3AppointedArchbishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
8 Sep 192650.5InstalledArchbishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
19 Jun 195579.3DiedArchbishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Romuald Jałbrzykowski (VIAF: 3553431)
Archbishop Romuald Jałbrzykowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŁętowo-Dąb

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1918, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast