Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marian Oles

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Slovenia

Titular Archbishop of Ratiaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1934Born
9 Jul 196126.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 198752.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ratiaria
28 Nov 198752.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Iraq
28 Nov 198752.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Kuwait
6 Jan 198853.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ratiaria
199156.0ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Kuwait
9 Apr 199459.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kazakhstan
9 Apr 199459.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kyrgyzstan
9 Apr 199459.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Uzbekistan
28 Dec 199662.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tadjikistan
11 Dec 200167.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Slovenia
11 Dec 200167.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to North Macedonia
1 May 200267.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Slovenia
1 May 200267.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to North Macedonia
24 May 200570.4DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Marian Oles (VIAF: 89318539)
Archbishop Marian Oles (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Slovenia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMiastkowo, Poland

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,422
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 16 Jan 2021

Quantcast