Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Zhan Silu

Bishop of Xiapu [Funing], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Mindong)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1961 Born
24 Jun 198928.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jan 200038.8Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Xiapu [Funing], China
5 Aug 200544.3SelectedBishop of Xiapu [Funing], China
22 Sep 201857.5ConfirmedBishop of Xiapu [Funing], China

MicroData Summary for Vincent Zhan Silu
Bishop Vincent Zhan Silu (born ) Bishop of Xiapu [Funing]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopImmaculée Conception, Cathedral, Beijing, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Xiapu [Funing].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 22 Sep 2018
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Sep 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,674

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast