Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Hanyang [Hanyang]

Dioecesis Haniamensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Hankow [Hankou]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Hanyang, Hubei, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Hanyang [Hanyang]
12 December 1923ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Orientale} Prefecture Apostolic of Hanyang [Hanyang] (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Puchi [Puqi] (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Wuchang [Wuchang] (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Hanyang [Hanyang]
14 July 1927ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Hanyang [Hanyang] Vicariate Apostolic of Hanyang [Hanyang]
Diocese of Hanyang [Hanyang]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Hanyang [Hanyang] Diocese of Hanyang [Hanyang]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Hanyang [Hanyang]
194955,0004,000,0001.4%4413,75011ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.4, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 7 Sep 2020

Quantcast