Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]

Archidioecesis Zinanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Zhang Xianwang, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 25,000 (9,656 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Kao-Tu-Sih-Hsiang, Jinan, Shandong, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong)
3 September 1839ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong) (erected)
2 January 1884Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong) Mission "Sui Iuris" of Southern Shantung {Scian-Ton Meridionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale}
8 January 1886Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong) Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale}
22 February 1894Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Shantung {Scian-Ton Orientale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tsinanfu
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Shantung {Scian-Ton Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Tsinanfu
16 April 1929Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Tsinanfu Mission "Sui Iuris" of Changtien (erected)
5 April 1931Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Tsinanfu Prefecture Apostolic of Linqing [Lintsing] (erected)
Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Tsinanfu Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]
195044,0165,000,000.9%1965845247928ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.4, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 16 May 2020

Quantcast