Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignatius P’i-Shu-Shih

Deceased

Archbishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1897Born
1 Jul 192831.4Ordained PriestPriest of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China
26 Jul 194952.4AppointedArchbishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China
11 Oct 194952.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China
16 May 197881.2DiedArchbishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China

MicroData Summary for Ignatius P’i-Shu-Shih
Archbishop Ignatius P’i-Shu-Shih (born , died ) Archbishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCha-ling, Archdiocese of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]
Ordained BishopShanghai

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 93
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast