Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Zhengding [Chengting]

Dioecesis Cemtimensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • [Paul Dong Guanhua], Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's Hosue, Zhengding, Hebei, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}
2 April 1856ErectedDiocese of Peking [Beijing] Vicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale} (erected)
15 April 1924Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Central Chi-Li {Ce-Li Centrale}
Prefecture Apostolic of Lihsien (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Chengting [Zhengding]
3 December 1924ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale} Vicariate Apostolic of Chengting [Zhengding]
18 March 1929Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Chengting [Zhengding] Prefecture Apostolic of Chaohsien [Zhaoxian] (erected)
2 March 1933Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Chengting [Zhengding] Prefecture Apostolic of Shunteh [Xingtai] (erected)
Diocese of Zhengding [Chengting]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Chengting [Zhengding] Diocese of Zhengding [Chengting]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Zhengding [Chengting]
194852,0004,000,0001.3%535398135121ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.2, 24 Dec 2019; Data: 1 Jan 2020

Quantcast