Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Milan Šašik, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1952Born
17 Aug 197219.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
27 Sep 197523.0Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Mission
2 Jun 197623.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Mission
6 Jun 197623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
12 Nov 200250.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
12 Nov 200250.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bononia
6 Jan 200350.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bononia
17 Mar 201057.5AppointedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
14 Jul 202067.8DiedBishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Milan Šašik
Bishop Milan Šašik C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLehota, Slovakia
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceHospital, Uzhorod

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Mar 2010
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 486
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,309
  • prof/c01/od: CB, 11 Jan 2016
  • d: CB, 14 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast