Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Malecki

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Leningrad, Russian Federation

Titular Bishop of Dionysiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1861Born
1884²22.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Aug 192665.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Leningrad, Russian Federation
12 Aug 192665.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysiana
12 Aug 192665.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysiana
28 Apr 193473.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Leningrad, Russian Federation
17 Jan 193573.7DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Leningrad, Russian Federation

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton Malecki
Bishop Anton Malecki (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Leningrad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Petersburg
Ordained BishopOur Lady of France, Church, Leningrad, Apostolic Administration of Leningrad

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • ab/ob: CB, 16 Oct 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1926, Number 49
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 39, Number 2,424
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast