Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Romualdas Krikšciunas

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Panevėžys, Lithuania

Titular Bishop of Amaia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1930Born
12 Sep 195424.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Nov 196939.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
7 Nov 196939.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Amaia
21 Dec 196939.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amaia
6 Jul 197342.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Panevėžys, Lithuania
15 May 198352.8ResignedApostolic Administrator of Panevėžys, Lithuania
2 Nov 201080.2DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Panevėžys, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Romualdas Krikšciunas
Bishop Romualdas Krikšciunas (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Panevėžys

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaunas, Archdiocese of Kaunas
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kaunas, Archdiocese of Kaunas

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 369
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast