Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Osório Willibaldo Stoffel, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rondonópolis, Mato Grosso, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1921Born
26 Jul 194827.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
27 Nov 197049.3AppointedPrelate of Rondonópolis, Mato Grosso, Brazil
6 Aug 197150.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
10 Oct 197150.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus
26 May 197856.8ResignedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
15 Feb 198664.6AppointedBishop of Rondonópolis, Mato Grosso, Brazil
19 Nov 199776.3RetiredBishop of Rondonópolis, Mato Grosso, Brazil
10 May 200280.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Rondonópolis, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Osório Willibaldo Stoffel
Bishop Osório Willibaldo Stoffel O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rondonópolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuzerna-Joaçaba
Ordained BishopIgreja Matriz, Church, Luzerna

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 853
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 877
  • qofm: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Mar 2021

Quantcast