Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodardo Leitz, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1915Born
30 Jun 194025.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
27 Nov 197055.5AppointedBishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
13 Feb 197155.7Ordained BishopBishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
12 May 199075.0RetiredBishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
27 Feb 199983.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Teodardo Leitz
Bishop Teodardo Leitz O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dourados

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarlsruhe, Germany

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 793

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast