Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Pius VIII

Francesco Saverio Maria Felice Castiglioni

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1761Born
17 Dec 178524.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Aug 180038.7AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
17 Aug 180038.7Ordained BishopBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
8 Mar 181654.3AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
8 Mar 181654.3Elevated to Cardinal
29 Apr 181654.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
4 Aug 182159.7AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
13 Aug 182159.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
14 Nov 182159.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
31 Mar 182967.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
5 Apr 182967.3InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
30 Nov 183069.0DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Maria Felice Castiglioni (VIAF: 68923521)
Pope Francesco Saverio Maria Felice Castiglioni (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCingoli, Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli
Ordained BishopSs. Domenico and Sisto, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter's, Grotto, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
  • a cardinal for 13.0 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 124, and Page 270
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 12
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 276, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 359, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 414, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 473, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 533, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 627, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 676, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 717, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 850, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast