Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Quintano Bonifaz

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Toledo, Spain

Titular Archbishop of Pharsalus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1698¹Born
20 Jan 174951.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
20 Jan 174951.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pharsalus
16 Mar 174951.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Pharsalus
11 Aug 175557.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Toledo, Spain
18 Dec 177476.9DiedApostolic Administrator of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Quintano Bonifaz
Archbishop Manuel Quintano Bonifaz (born 1698, died ) Apostolic Administrator of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalas de los Infantes

  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 336
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 66, Number 314
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 6
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 276, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast