Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Agliardi

Deceased

Chancellor of the Apostolic Chancery

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1832Born
22 Dec 185523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
23 Sep 188452.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina
23 Sep 188452.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to India
12 Oct 188452.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Palaestina
9 May 188754.6AppointedPro-Secretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
6 Oct 188856.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
4 Apr 188956.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
16 May 189360.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
22 Jun 189663.7Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 189663.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
3 Dec 189664.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
14 Dec 189967.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
14 Dec 189967.2AppointedBishop of Albano, Italy
22 Jun 190370.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
29 Jun 190875.8AppointedChancellor of the Apostolic Chancery
19 Mar 191582.5DiedChancellor of the Apostolic Chancery

MicroData Summary for Antonio Agliardi (VIAF: 56602803)
Antonio Cardinal Agliardi (born , died ) Chancellor of Apostolic Chancery

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCologno al Serio, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Andrea delle Fratte, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Don Colombo, Chapel, Osio di Sotto, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
  • a cardinal for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 166, and Page 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 49, and Page 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jun 1896
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 50
  • x933/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 23, and Page 49, and Page 57
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 276, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 344, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 359, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 414, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 483, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 582, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 641, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 676, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 721, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 850, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast