Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Maria Cardinal Doria Pamphilj

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1751Born
27 Feb 177321.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
11 Jul 177321.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Jul 177321.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 177321.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
6 Sep 177321.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
Feb 1785³33.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
14 Feb 178533.2Elevated to Cardinal
11 Apr 178533.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
16 Mar 179745.3AppointedSecretary of the Secretariat of State
16 Mar 179745.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Sacred Consulta
29 Aug 179947.7ResignedSecretary of the Secretariat of State
29 Aug 179947.7ResignedPrefect of the Congregation of the Sacred Consulta
20 Sep 180250.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
26 Sep 180351.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
Feb 1808³56.2AppointedPro-Secretary of the Secretariat of State
Mar 1808³56.3ResignedPro-Secretary of the Secretariat of State
26 Sep 181462.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
10 Feb 181664.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Doria Pamphilj (VIAF: 305115040)
Giuseppe Maria Cardinal Doria Pamphilj (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Ildefonso, Church, La Granja, Diocese of Segovia, Spain
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Cecilia, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
  • a cardinal for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Feb 1785
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 90, Number 462
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 374
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 242
  • xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 7
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 276, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Number 3,285
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast