Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jaime Cardinal de Barros Câmara

Deceased

Archbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio

Bishop of Brazil, Faithful of the Eastern Rites


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1894Born
1 Jan 192025.4Ordained PriestPriest of Florianópolis (Santa Caterina), Brazil
19 Dec 193541.4AppointedBishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
2 Feb 193641.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
15 Sep 194147.1AppointedArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
3 Jul 194349.0AppointedArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
15 Sep 194349.1InstalledArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
18 Feb 194651.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 194651.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio
6 Nov 195056.3AppointedBishop of Brazil, Military
14 Nov 195157.3AppointedBishop of Brazil, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
9 Nov 196369.3ResignedBishop of Brazil, Military
18 Feb 197176.6DiedArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jaime de Barros Câmara (VIAF: 6718677)
Jaime Cardinal de Barros Câmara (born , died ) Archbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão José

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
  • a cardinal for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1936, Number 5
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 497, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 853, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast