Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fidel Herráez Vegas

Archbishop Emeritus of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1944 Born
19 May 196823.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 199651.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madrid, Spain
14 May 199651.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cediae
29 Jun 199651.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cediae
30 Oct 201571.2AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
28 Nov 201571.3InstalledArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
6 Oct 202076.1RetiredArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Fidel Herráez Vegas
Archbishop Fidel Herráez Vegas (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceÁvila, Diocese of Ávila
Ordained BishopSanta María la Real de la Almudena, Cathedral, Madrid, Archdiocese of Madrid

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Burgos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,765
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2015
  • i: CB, 30 Oct 2015
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast