Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos Manuel Escribano Subías

Archbishop of Zaragoza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1964 Born
14 Jul 199631.9Ordained PriestPriest of Zaragoza, Spain
20 Jul 201045.9AppointedBishop of Teruel y Albarracín, Spain
26 Sep 201046.1Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel y Albarracín, Spain
13 May 201651.7AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada-Logroño, Spain
6 Oct 202056.1AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
21 Nov 202056.2InstalledArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Carlos Manuel Escribano Subías
Archbishop Carlos Manuel Escribano Subías (born ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarballo, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela
Ordained BishopCathedral, Teruel, Diocese of Teruel y Albarracín

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Zaragoza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,801
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 May 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast