Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Rico Pavés

Bishop of Jerez de la Frontera, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1966 Born
11 Oct 199226.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 201245.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Getafe, Spain
6 Jul 201245.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Mentesa
21 Sep 201245.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mentesa
9 Jun 202154.6AppointedBishop of Jerez de la Frontera, Spain
31 Jul 202154.8InstalledBishop of Jerez de la Frontera, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Rico Pavés
Bishop José Rico Pavés (born ) Bishop of Jerez de la Frontera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranada
Ordained BishopSagrado Corazón, Shrine, Cerro de ls Angeles

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jerez de la Frontera.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2012
  • ob: CB, 12 Jul 2012
  • c2+: CB, 21 Sep 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,543
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Jun 2021

Quantcast