Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Palica

Deceased

Vicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1869Born
18 Dec 189223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
25 Apr 191747.5AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
25 Apr 191747.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
20 May 191747.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
16 Dec 193667.1DiedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Palica
Archbishop Giuseppe Palica (born , died ) Vicegerent of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1917, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 23 Dec 2020

Quantcast