Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Theophilus Klonowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA

Titular Bishop of Daldis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1898Born
8 Aug 192022.4Ordained PriestPriest of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
10 May 194749.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
10 May 194749.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Daldis
2 Jul 194749.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Daldis
15 May 197375.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
6 May 197779.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Henry Theophilus Klonowski
Bishop Henry Theophilus Klonowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Scranton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScranton

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/r: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast