Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Riccardo Bartoloni

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of

Titular Archbishop of Laodicea in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1885Born
30 Apr 192842.7AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Lithuania
21 May 192842.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Syria
27 May 192842.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Syria
9 Nov 192843.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lithuania
9 Apr 193347.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of
11 Oct 193348.2DiedApostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of

MicroData Summary for Riccardo Bartoloni (VIAF: 88696249)
Archbishop Riccardo Bartoloni (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Egypt, Arab Republic of

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant'Agata del Mugello, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Death PlaceJerusalem

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1928, Number 35
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast