Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alberto Ortega Martín

Apostolic Nuncio to Chile

Titular Archbishop of Midila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1962 Born
28 Apr 199027.4Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
1 Aug 201552.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Jordan
1 Aug 201552.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Iraq
1 Aug 201552.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Midila
10 Oct 201552.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Midila
7 Oct 201956.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile

MicroData Summary for Alberto Ortega Martín
Archbishop Alberto Ortega Martín (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Chile.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Aug 2015
  • ob: CB, 10 Sep 2015
  • c2: CB, 10 Oct 2015
  • c34: CB, 12 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,661
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast