Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Stangl

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Würzburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1907Born
16 Mar 193022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
27 Jun 195749.8AppointedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
12 Sep 195750.0Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
8 Jan 197971.4ResignedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
8 Apr 197971.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Stangl (VIAF: 62341526)
Bishop Josef Stangl (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKronach
Death PlaceSchweinfurt
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Würzburg, Diocese of Würzburg

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast