Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sergio Hernán Pérez de Arce Arriagada, SS.CC.

Bishop of San Bartolomé de Chillán, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1963 Born
2 Mar 198521.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
29 Apr 198925.6Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
15 Dec 199027.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
21 Sep 201855.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of San Bartolomé de Chillán, Chile
5 Feb 202056.4AppointedBishop of San Bartolomé de Chillán, Chile
11 Jul 202056.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Bartolomé de Chillán, Chile

MicroData Summary for Sergio Hernán Pérez de Arce Arriagada
Bishop Sergio Hernán Pérez de Arce Arriagada SS.CC. (born ) Bishop of San Bartolomé de Chillán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoronel, Archdiocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione)
Ordained PriestValparaíso, Diocese of Valparaíso
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chillán, Diocese of San Bartolomé de Chillán

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Bartolomé de Chillán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Sep 2018
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2020
  • bp: CB, 5 Feb 2020
  • ob: CB, 8 Feb 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast