Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Friedrich Josef von Schreiber

Deceased

Archbishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1819Born
8 Jun 184324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
10 Jun 187556.0SelectedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
5 Jul 187556.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
5 Sep 187556.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
23 May 189071.0DiedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Josef von Schreiber (VIAF: 72204906)
Archbishop Friedrich Josef von Schreiber (born , died ) Archbishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarkt-Bissingen
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bamberg, Archdiocese of Bamberg

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 140
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 47
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 3, Number 108, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 433, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 998, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,756

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast