Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Cristián Castro Toovey

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Santiago de Chile

Titular Bishop of Tigava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1969 Born
14 Aug 199626.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Chile
24 May 199727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
22 Jun 202151.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
22 Jun 202151.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigava
13 Aug 202151.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigava

MicroData Summary for Cristián Castro Toovey
Father Cristián Castro Toovey (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopOutdoors, Cerro San Cristóbal, Inmaculada Concepción, Shrine, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2021
  • od/c1: CB, 22 Jun 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Jul 2021

Quantcast