Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Jakob von Hauck

Deceased

Archbishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1861Born
3 Aug 188422.6Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
25 May 191250.4SelectedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
18 Jun 191250.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
25 Jul 191250.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany
7 Jun 192058.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Würzburg, Germany
1 Dec 192462.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Würzburg, Germany
20 Jan 194381.0DiedArchbishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Jakob von Hauck (VIAF: 32794379)
Archbishop Johann Jakob von Hauck (born , died ) Archbishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMiltenberg

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 179, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1912, Number 49
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 78
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 3, Number 108, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 433, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 998, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast