Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Alberto Godoy Labraña

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

Titular Bishop of Pudentiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1969 Born
12 Aug 199526.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Chile
18 May 199627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
22 Jun 202152.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
22 Jun 202152.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pudentiana
13 Aug 202152.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pudentiana

MicroData Summary for Carlos Alberto Godoy Labraña
Bishop Carlos Alberto Godoy Labraña (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopOutdoors, Cerro San Cristóbal, Inmaculada Concepción, Shrine, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2021
  • od/c1: CB, 22 Jun 2021
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Jul 2021
  • c34: CB, 13 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Aug 2021

Quantcast