Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raphael Simon Ndingi Mwana’a Nzeki

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Nairobi, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1931Born
31 Jan 196129.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nairobi, Kenya
29 May 196937.4AppointedBishop of Machakos, Kenya
1 Aug 196937.6Ordained BishopBishop of Machakos, Kenya
30 Aug 197139.6AppointedBishop of Nakuru, Kenya
14 Jun 199664.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Nairobi, Kenya
21 Apr 199765.3SucceededArchbishop of Nairobi, Kenya
6 Oct 200775.7RetiredArchbishop of Nairobi, Kenya
31 Mar 202088.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Nairobi, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Raphael Simon Ndingi Mwana’a Nzeki
Archbishop Raphael Simon Ndingi Mwana’a Nzeki (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Nairobi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMwala
Ordained BishopKololo Terrace, Kampala, Archdiocese of Kampala, Uganda
Death PlaceClergy House, Nairobi, Archdiocese of Nairobi
Buried Place (Original)Holy Family, Basilica, Nairobi, Archdiocese of Nairobi

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 50.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 230
  • d/mn: CB, 31 Mar 2020
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Feb 2021

Quantcast