Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Meru

Dioecesis Meruensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Salesius Mugambi, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 7 May 1953
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Nyeri
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Kenya
  • Square Kilometers: 9,546 (3,687 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: https://catholicdioceseofmeru.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 16, 60200 Meru, Kenya
  • Telephone: 721.491.149; 733.607.660
  • Fax: (064)30.524

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Meru
10 March 1926ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Kenya Prefecture Apostolic of Meru (erected)
Diocese of Meru
7 May 1953ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Meru Diocese of Meru
14 June 1954Territory AddedDiocese of Meru
Diocese of Nyeri
20 February 1956Territory LostDiocese of Meru
Archdiocese of Nairobi
Prefecture Apostolic of Kitui (erected) (Kitui)
25 January 1965Territory LostDiocese of Meru (Eastern Part of Marsabit) Diocese of Marsabit
25 October 1967Territory AddedArchdiocese of Nairobi (Garissa) Diocese of Meru
25 October 1967Territory AddedDiocese of Mombasa (Tana River) Diocese of Meru
12 January 1973Territory LostDiocese of Meru (Ekarakara)
Diocese of Nyeri (Ithanga Hills)
Diocese of Machakos
31 August 1973Territory AddedDiocese of Nyeri (Timau (except near Nanyuki and west of Oltulili river)) Diocese of Meru
22 September 1973Territory AddedDiocese of Nyeri (Isiolo) Diocese of Meru
9 December 1976Territory LostDiocese of Mombasa (Tana River and Lamu)
Diocese of Meru (North Eastern Province)
Prefecture Apostolic of Garissa (erected)
9 June 1986Territory LostDiocese of Meru (Embu) Diocese of Embu (erected)
21 May 1990Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Meru (from Nairobi)
15 December 1995Territory LostDiocese of Meru (Isiolo) Vicariate Apostolic of Isiolo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Meru
194911,873308,0003.9%222253929379ap1951
Diocese of Meru
1970142,3001,043,60013.6%2044642,2235712126ap1971
1980262,7051,118,00023.5%2136574,6085413129ap1981
1990466,2851,398,85633.3%2638647,2855615330ap1991
1999676,2522,018,25033.5%4147887,6846527231ap2000
2000689,7772,623,72526.3%69481175,8956627234ap2001
2001710,4701,950,00036.4%82411235,7765928536ap2002
2002713,5501,950,58536.6%80381186,0475729138ap2003
2003720,6852,050,00035.2%83411245,8116223738ap2004
2004737,8212,152,53534.3%93451385,3466928340ap2005
2013846,0002,724,00031.1%127411685,0355839860ap2014
2016906,5542,920,09131.0%154441984,5787140264ap2017
2019984,1003,166,90031.1%136321685,8575940277ap2020
20211,036,8553,336,68531.1%143441875,5447136980ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Prefecture Apostolic of Meru
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 45, Page 705, to Page 710
  • Diocese of Meru
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 46, Page 33, to Page 35
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 47, Page 154, and Page 155
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 59, Page 1,066, and Page 1,067
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 65, Page 509
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 65, Page 608, and Page 609
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 82, Page 938

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 31 Dec 2023