Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Mittathany

Archbishop Emeritus of Imphal, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1931 Born
23 Apr 195927.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 196937.9AppointedBishop of Tezpur, India
27 Sep 196938.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tezpur, India
28 Mar 198048.7AppointedBishop of Imphal, India
10 Jul 199563.9AppointedArchbishop of Imphal, India
12 Jul 200675.0RetiredArchbishop of Imphal, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mittathany
Archbishop Joseph Mittathany (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Imphal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalikavu
Ordained BishopSaint Jean Bosco, Cathedral, Tezpur, Diocese of Tezpur

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Imphal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 517

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Feb 2021

Quantcast