Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Victor Lyngdoh

Archbishop of Shillong, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1956 Born
25 Jan 198731.0Ordained PriestPriest of Shillong, India
28 Jan 200650.0AppointedBishop of Nongstoin, India
2 Apr 200650.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nongstoin, India
15 Oct 201660.7AppointedBishop of Jowai, India
20 Nov 201660.8InstalledBishop of Jowai, India
28 Dec 202064.9AppointedArchbishop of Shillong, India
6 Feb 202165.0InstalledArchbishop of Shillong, India

MicroData Summary for Victor Lyngdoh
Archbishop Victor Lyngdoh (born ) Archbishop of Shillong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWahlang
Ordained BishopCalvary Grounds, Shillong, Archdiocese of Shillong

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Shillong.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,109
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2016
  • i: CB, 19 Nov 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2020
  • i: AM, 5 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Feb 2021

Quantcast