Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tezpur

Dioecesis Tezpurensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 16 January 1964
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Guwahati
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Evangelization
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 15,320 (5,917 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Tezpur-784001, Sonitpur, Assam, India
  • Telephone: (03712)220.193

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
16 January 1964ErectedDiocese of Dibrugarh (Subansiri, Siang, and part of Lakhimpur)
Diocese of Shillong (Darrang, Nowgong, and parts of Goalpara and Kamrup)
Diocese of Tezpur (erected)
26 June 1969Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Tezpur (from Calcutta)
20 January 1975Territory LostDiocese of Tezpur (Bhutan) Diocese of Darjeeling
30 March 1992Territory LostArchdiocese of Shillong-Gauhati
Diocese of Tezpur
Diocese of Tura
Diocese of Guwahati (erected) (Kokhrajar, Dhubri, Goalpara, Barpetta, Nalbari, Kamrup, and Nagaon (except Rupahihat, Kaliabar, and Samugari))
10 July 1995Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Tezpur (from Shillong)
7 December 2005Territory LostDiocese of Tezpur (Tawang, West Kameng, East Kameng, Papum Pare, Upper Subasini, Lower Subasini, Kurung Kamey, West Siang, East Siang, and Upper Siang) Diocese of Itanagar (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
197064,4503,714,0001.7%1514292,222215912ap1971
1980106,0007,036,0001.5%4017571,859289930ap1981
1990195,0006,201,0003.1%5626822,3782615040ap1991
1999175,8985,288,0003.3%4136772,2843918835ap2000
2000185,9395,973,9393.1%4338812,2954519740ap2001
2001190,2007,053,2002.7%4341842,2644820542ap2002
2002209,9807,085,0003.0%4545902,3335722043ap2003
2003218,1457,251,3723.0%4550952,2966222843ap2004
2004227,5667,334,3763.1%47541012,2536623546ap2005
2005108,8004,335,1002.5%4226681,600521030bul7Dec05
2010184,0414,623,0004.0%4729762,4213423130ap2011
2014191,9418,375,1912.3%5138892,1568923932ap2015
2017194,8208,705,6202.2%5738952,05011624232ap2018
2020201,8009,013,2002.2%61501111,81812825033ap2021
2022192,9928,375,2052.3%67651321,46214625033ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 56, Page 727, to Page 729
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 62, Page 29, and Page 30
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 87, Page 1,081, and Page 1,082

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 23 Jun 2024