Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Edward Henry Cardinal Howard of Norfolk

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Archbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Frascati

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1829Born
8 Dec 185425.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 187243.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Frascati, Italy
25 Jun 187243.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
30 Jun 187243.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Neocaesarea in Ponto
12 Mar 187748.0Elevated to Cardinal
20 Mar 187748.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
12 Dec 188152.8AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
24 Mar 188455.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
16 Sep 189263.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

MicroData Summary for Edward Henry Howard of Norfolk (VIAF: 255152152)
Edward Henry Cardinal Howard of Norfolk (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHainton, Lincolnshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceHatch Beauchamp, London Road, Brighton, East Sussex, Diocese of Southwark, England, Great Britain
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, Fitzalan Chapel, Castle, Arundel, West Sussex, Diocese of Southwark, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
  • a cardinal for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 406, and Page 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 48
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 80
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1877
  • loc: CL, 5 Apr 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 242, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 272, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 346, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 381, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 421, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 626, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 693, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 718, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 851, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast