Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to Canada



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luigi Bonazzi, Apostolic Nuncio

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Nunciature
  • Elevated: 16 October 1969
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: Canada
  • Official Web Site: http://www.nuntiatura.ca/
  • Mailing Address: 724 Manor Avenue, Ottawa, ON K1M 0E3, Canada
  • Telephone: (1-613)746-4914
  • Fax: 746-4786

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Delegation to Canada and Newfoundland
3 August 1899EstablishedDelegation to Canada and Newfoundland
Delegation to Canada
31 March 1949Name ChangedDelegation to Canada and Newfoundland Delegation to Canada
Nunciature to Canada
16 October 1969ElevatedDelegation to Canada Nunciature to Canada

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.3.1, 22 Nov 2019; Data: 17 Dec 2019

Quantcast